OK HB3398 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; requiring criminal history record check for current school district employees and for new teacher contracts; emergency.
Title
Schools; requiring criminal history record check for current school district employees and for new teacher contracts; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/19/2020 |
2020-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |