OK HB3397 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Utilities; enacting the Municipal Utilities Oversight Act; providing for board of adjustment to hear utility customer appeals; frivolous appeals; testing of utility meters; overcharges; effective date.
Title
Utilities; enacting the Municipal Utilities Oversight Act; providing for board of adjustment to hear utility customer appeals; frivolous appeals; testing of utility meters; overcharges; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |