OK HB3396 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Elections; vacancies of certain boards of education; modifying appointment of certain vacancies; effective date.
Title
Elections; vacancies of certain boards of education; modifying appointment of certain vacancies; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |