OK HB3384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; creating the Quality of Education Assessment for Oklahoma Citizens Act of 2010. Effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the Quality of Education Assessment for Oklahoma Citizens Act of 2010. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Randy Terrill [R] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Ayes: 56 Nays: 34 | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2010-03-10 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Jett | |
2010-03-10 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 26 | |
2010-03-10 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-10 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-10 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Christian, Duncan, Tibbs | |
2010-03-10 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 167 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3 | 168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |