OK HB3383 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; relating to low-point beer; modifying certain definition; relating to fees; creating certain surcharges; allowing certain military personnel exception to prohibition on transporting alcohol into state. Emergency.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; relating to low-point beer; modifying certain definition; relating to fees; creating certain surcharges; allowing certain military personnel exception to prohibition on transporting alcohol into state. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House: (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 05/28/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-05-26 | To Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14 | |
2010-05-26 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 75 Nays: 17 | |
2010-05-24 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Terrill | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 28; Ayes: 52 Nays: 45 | |
2010-05-24 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-20 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-13 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-11 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-05-10 | Title restored | |
2010-05-10 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Terrill, Duncan, Christian, Liebmann, McAffrey, Inman, Peters | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, SCs named Barrington, Reynolds, Coffee, Lamb, Jolley, Burrage, Laster | |
2010-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Veterans and Military Affairs committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 64 Nays: 2 | |
2010-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Terrill | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4; Ayes: 56 Nays: 40 | |
2010-03-09 | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-03 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Terrill | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 163 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 518 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 524 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 537 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 537 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 567 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 573 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 582 | New Code | See Bill Text |