OK HB3382 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Waters and water rights; subjecting certain violations to administrative penalties; setting maximum penalty; effective date.
Title
Waters and water rights; subjecting certain violations to administrative penalties; setting maximum penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Energy: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 5 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-27 | Senate | remove as principal author Representative Moore and substitute with Representative Marti |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |