OK HB3382 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Oklahoma Teacher Loan Repayment Program; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; creating the Oklahoma Teacher Loan Repayment Program; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 3 |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Albright |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Waldron, Provenzano |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |