OK HB3380 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physical therapists; practice; eliminating time limits; effective date.
Title
Physical therapists; practice; eliminating time limits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-02-07 | House | Remove Representative Moore as principal House author and substitute with Representative Stinson |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |