OK HB3376 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; exempting Commissioners of the Land Office from requirements of the Fleet Management Division; effective date.
Title
State government; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; exempting Commissioners of the Land Office from requirements of the Fleet Management Division; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 8 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Murdock |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 21 Nays: 21 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 16 |
2018-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |