OK HB3375 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amusements and sports; state-tribal gaming; nonhouse-banked table games; model tribal gaming contract; apportionment of fees received by the state.
Title
Amusements and sports; state-tribal gaming; nonhouse-banked table games; model tribal gaming contract; apportionment of fees received by the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-06 - Senate - Senate: ADVANCE (Y: 29 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 04/10/2018 |
2018-04-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Emergency failed: Ayes: 31 Nays: 14 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 29 Nays: 16 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-08 | House | Motion to reconsider tabled |
2018-03-08 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wallace |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22 |
2018-03-08 | House | Title restored |
2018-03-08 | House | Amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2018-03-08 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 280 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 280 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |