OK HB3373 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; designating various special license plates; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; designating various special license plates; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2018-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2018-04-05 | Senate | coauthored by Hall |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-12 | House | Amended |
2018-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-12 | House | Amended |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Wallace as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ortega |
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |