OK HB3372 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; requiring certain affidavit; modifying fees and directing deposit; effective dates.
Title
Motor vehicles; requiring certain affidavit; modifying fees and directing deposit; effective dates.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Ford [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2 |
2020-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-03 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Ford |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |