OK HB3372 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; computer-assisted mass appraisal; documentary stamps; fees; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; computer-assisted mass appraisal; documentary stamps; fees; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/08/2018 |
2018-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2018-05-01 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jech |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Amended |
2018-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-13 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Title stricken |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2947 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2947 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2947 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |