OK HB3370 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; trespassing on certain property; increasing certain monetary penalties; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; trespassing on certain property; increasing certain monetary penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/03/2018 |
2018-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2018-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 31 |
2018-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-06 | House | General Order |
2018-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |