OK HB3363 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband; Rural Broadband Expansion Act; modifying name; Council; creating the Broadband Governing Board; creating Office; Executive Director; creation of Statewide Broadband Plan; emergency.
Title
Broadband; Rural Broadband Expansion Act; modifying name; Council; creating the Broadband Governing Board; creating Office; Executive Director; creation of Statewide Broadband Plan; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Phillips |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |