OK HB3350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; individual income tax; modifying rates; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; individual income tax; modifying rates; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 17 |
2022-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |