OK HB3350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-20)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-20)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; cost-of-living; increasing benefit; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; cost-of-living; increasing benefit; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 5 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Young |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Matthews |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kirt |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Ikley-Freeman |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Brooks |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Nichols |
2020-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Ranson |
2020-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Provenzano |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Leewright |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Haste |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Coleman |
2020-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Waldron |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boggs |
2020-05-13 | Senate | coauthored by Smith |
2020-05-12 | Senate | coauthored by Albright |
2020-05-12 | Senate | coauthored by Fugate |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-03-12 | Senate | coauthored by West (Josh) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by McEntire |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Stark |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Boles |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Perryman |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | House Rule suspended |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Rosino, Kidd, Pemberton, Hall, Scott, Dugger, Newhouse, Stanley, Bullard, Pederson, Weaver, Sharp |
2020-03-10 | House | Remove Senator Pemberton as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Thompson |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Meredith, Humphrey, Davis, Pae, Marti, Roberts (Sean), Brewer, Wallace, Sims, Virgin, Munson, Nollan, Hill, Roe, Manger, West (Tammy) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed, Kerbs, Grego, ODonnell, Phillips, Luttrell, Caldwell (Trey) |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Frix |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |