OK HB3347 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Budgets; public hearing on municipal proposed budget; requiring to be published on municipality's website; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budgets; public hearing on municipal proposed budget; requiring to be published on municipality's website; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2018
2018-05-03HouseSent to Governor
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-03HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 13
2018-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-27HouseSA's received
2018-04-27SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-26SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2018-04-26SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-04-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Brecheen
2018-04-25SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Dahm
2018-04-02SenateReported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 9
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-03-01HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
2018-02-26HouseReferred to County and Municipal Government
2018-02-26HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Sean)
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1117208New CodeSee Bill Text
705128New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3347&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB3347%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3347%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB3347%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB3347%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB3347%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3347%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB3347%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3347_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB3347_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback