OK HB3331 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Title insurance; requiring certain waiver be attained; certificates of authority; modifying certain authorized party; effective date.
Title
Title insurance; requiring certain waiver be attained; certificates of authority; modifying certain authorized party; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Perryman |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |