OK HB3324 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development; Quick Action Closing Fund; providing for receipt; Quality Jobs Acts; incentives.
Title
Economic development; Quick Action Closing Fund; providing for receipt; Quality Jobs Acts; incentives.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Sen. Stephanie Bice [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Rep. Josh West [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Approved by Governor 04/30/2018 |
2018-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 7 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Quinn; authored by Senator Bice |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion expired |
2018-03-08 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Fetgatter |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 14; Ayes: 50 Nays: 25 |
2018-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hall, Cockroft, West (Josh) |
2018-03-08 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |