OK HB3320 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; requiring certain teacher candidates to study dyslexia characteristics and instruction techniques and other related disorders; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; requiring certain teacher candidates to study dyslexia characteristics and instruction techniques and other related disorders; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-06SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2020-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Albright
2020-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2020-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0
2020-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sterling, Phillips, Davis, Townley
2020-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2020-02-27HouseAuthored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
2020-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
2020-02-19HouseReferred to Higher Education and Career Tech
2020-02-19HouseWithdrawn from Common Education Committee
2020-02-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2020-02-03HouseAuthored by Representative Conley
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback