OK HB3318 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; nonprofit; school supplies.
Title
Revenue and taxation; sales tax exemption; nonprofit; school supplies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 33; Ayes: 59 Nays: 33 |
2020-03-04 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 62 Nays: 26 |
2020-03-04 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Blancett |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 48 |
2020-03-04 | House | Amended |
2020-03-04 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Blancett |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |