OK HB3317 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Failed in Committee - Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; High Mobility Multipurpose Wheeled Vehicles; registration; use on highways; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; High Mobility Multipurpose Wheeled Vehicles; registration; use on highways; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateFailed in Committee - Appropriations
2018-04-03SenateRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee
2018-04-02SenateReferred to Appr/Sub-Finance
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
2018-03-14HouseAmended
2018-03-14HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-14HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2018-03-14HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass Transportation Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Transportation
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Fetgatter
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4711515Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback