OK HB3315 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco; underage tobacco use; modifying penalty; effective date.
Title
Tobacco; underage tobacco use; modifying penalty; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 52 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-11 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-10 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 31 |
2022-05-10 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 6 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 13 |
2022-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |