OK HB3313 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital visitation; No Patient Left Alone Act; modifying requirements; claims; creating private cause of action; damages; effective date; emergency.
Title
Hospital visitation; No Patient Left Alone Act; modifying requirements; claims; creating private cause of action; damages; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2022-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Bashore, Fetgatter |
2022-03-21 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Stark, McDugle, Phillips |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Roe |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |