OK HB3313 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education; Dyslexia and Education Task Force; modifying task force membership; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; Dyslexia and Education Task Force; modifying task force membership; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2018
2018-05-03HouseSent to Governor
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-03HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
2018-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-23HouseSA's received
2018-04-23SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-19SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-19SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2018-04-19SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-04-19SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2018-03-26SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2018-03-14Senatecoauthored by West (Tammy)
2018-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
2018-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2018-03-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Osburn (Mike)
2018-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Baker
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3313&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB3313%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB3313%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB3313%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB3313%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB3313%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB3313%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB3313_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3313_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB3313_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback