OK HB3309 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; changing name of residency program; directing administration of induction program as funds are available; effective date.
Title
Schools; changing name of residency program; directing administration of induction program as funds are available; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 05/02/2018 |
2018-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Baker |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1 | 116 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 11 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 122 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 182 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 203 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |