OK HB3297 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/23/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Compressed natural gas; transferring regulation and implementation; creating the Compressed Natural Gas Conversion Safety and Regulation Fund.
Title
Compressed natural gas; transferring regulation and implementation; creating the Compressed Natural Gas Conversion Safety and Regulation Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/23/2014 |
2014-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-19 | House | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 19; Ayes: 54 Nays: 21 |
2014-05-19 | House | Ayes: 19 Nays: 60 |
2014-05-19 | House | Motion to table bill failed |
2014-05-19 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-05-19 | House | SAs considered |
2014-05-07 | House | Laid over |
2014-05-07 | House | SAs considered |
2014-04-16 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Finance Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 |
2014-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cockroft |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-25 | House | Emergency added |
2014-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 142 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2357 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 20 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
74 | 130 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |