OK HB3294 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative Blancett
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative Blancett
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; savings from implementation of Smart Justice Reform Act; calculations; appropriation to Department of Corrections; transfer to County Community Safety Investment Fund; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; savings from implementation of Smart Justice Reform Act; calculations; appropriation to Department of Corrections; transfer to County Community Safety Investment Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Blancett |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-24 | House | Amended |
2022-03-24 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-24 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2022-03-24 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-03-02 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |