OK HB3287 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Laid over on Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Ethics; prohibiting use of certain state property for personal political advocacy; providing penalties; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics; prohibiting use of certain state property for personal political advocacy; providing penalties; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseLaid over on Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseAmended
2018-03-15HouseHouse Rule suspended
2018-03-15HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2018-03-15HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bush
2018-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Enns
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback