OK HB3277 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - SA's received
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing immediate transfer of inmates upon request; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing immediate transfer of inmates upon request; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), West (Kevin) |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Humphrey |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |