OK HB3259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; adjudication; Department of Human Services; amendments to internal documents; effective date.
Title
Children; adjudication; Department of Human Services; amendments to internal documents; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-03-11 | Senate | remove as coauthor Representative(s) Albright |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 18 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Albright |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Ortega |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |