OK HB3258 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Torts; granting immunity from liability when providing voluntary architectural or engineering services to the Department of Emergency Management; effective date.
Title
Torts; granting immunity from liability when providing voluntary architectural or engineering services to the Department of Emergency Management; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |