OK HB3234 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; vision plans; eliminating deadline by which certain information shall be submitted; excess vision company offerings; emergency.
Title
State government; vision plans; eliminating deadline by which certain information shall be submitted; excess vision company offerings; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Marty Quinn [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Approved by Governor 04/12/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 3 |
2018-03-14 | House | Emergency added |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |