OK HB3231 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Department of Health; county health department names; effective date.
Title
State Department of Health; county health department names; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 21 |
2022-03-07 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-07 | House | Amended |
2022-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-07 | House | General Order |
2022-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative CrosswhiteHader |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |