OK HB3224 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; providing exemption from records retention requirement under certain circumstances; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; providing exemption from records retention requirement under certain circumstances; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 12 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Motion expired |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Shaw |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 12 Nays: 29 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2018-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 17 |
2018-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | House Rule suspended |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |