OK HB3220 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; authorizing State Board of Career and Technology Education to develop certification system for teachers and instructors who teach in technology center school districts; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; authorizing State Board of Career and Technology Education to develop certification system for teachers and instructors who teach in technology center school districts; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseApproved by Governor 05/10/2018
2018-05-03HouseSent to Governor
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-03HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-03HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-03HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2018-05-03HouseSA's read, adopted
2018-04-19HouseSA's received
2018-04-19SenateEngrossed to House
2018-04-18SenateReferred for engrossment
2018-04-18SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2018-04-18SenateEmergency clause restored
2018-04-18SenateEnacting clause restored
2018-04-18SenateTitle restored
2018-04-18SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2018-04-18SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-04-11SenateEmergency clause stricken
2018-04-11SenateEnacting clause stricken
2018-04-11SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2018-04-11SenateReferred to Rules
2018-04-11SenateWithdrawn from Education committee
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 3
2018-03-12HouseTitle stricken
2018-03-12HouseAmended
2018-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2018-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Nollan
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
706189New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback