OK HB3218 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Civil procedure; service of process; electronic means; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure; service of process; electronic means; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-19SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2024-02-22SenateFirst Reading
2024-02-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2024-02-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2024-02-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 24
2024-02-21HouseAmended
2024-02-21HouseHouse Rule suspended
2024-02-21HouseGeneral Order
2024-02-15HouseAuthored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
2024-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
2024-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government
2024-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative West (Kevin)
2024-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3218&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB3218%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB3218%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB3218%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB3218%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB3218%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20WEST-AO.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB3218%20FA1%20WESTKE-AO(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3218%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3218%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB3218%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB3218_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback