OK HB3216 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services; insurance; requirements; effective date.
Title
Emergency medical services; insurance; requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Rep. Chris Sneed [R] | Rep. Eric Roberts [R] |
Sen. Dewayne Pemberton [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Eric) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pemberton |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 15 |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sneed |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lepak |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |