OK HB3210 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-20 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Health care funding; cigarette excise tax; apportionment; sale of excise tax stamps; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care funding; cigarette excise tax; apportionment; sale of excise tax stamps; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-05-16 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-20HouseMotion expired
2016-05-18HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cox
2016-05-18HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 59
2016-05-18HouseJCR adopted
2016-05-18HouseGeneral Order
2016-05-17HouseEmergency removed
2016-05-17HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-16HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2016-05-12HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Treat
2016-05-12HouseAuthored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author)
2016-05-12HouseAuthored by Representative Sears, Casey
2016-05-12HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback