OK HB3195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Cosmetology and Barbering Act; adding exemption; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Oklahoma Cosmetology and Barbering Act; adding exemption; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | Authored by Senator Jett (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-24 | House | General Order |
2022-02-16 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |