OK HB3195 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Immigration; directing law enforcement personnel to comply with requests made in immigration detainers issued by the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement; effective date.
Title
Immigration; directing law enforcement personnel to comply with requests made in immigration detainers issued by the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Garry Mize [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] |
Sen. Roland Pederson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2020-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 21 |
2020-02-10 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad), Boles, Roberts (Sean), Sanders |
2020-02-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), Mize |
2020-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |