OK HB3193 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Birth certificates; modification; father's name listed; effective date.
Title
Birth certificates; modification; father's name listed; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McDugle |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |