OK HB3191 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; definitions; cost approach; valuation of personal property; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; definitions; cost approach; valuation of personal property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 9 |
2020-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-10 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |