OK HB3190 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Merrick
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Coauthored by Senator Merrick
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; sanctions; jury trial; individualized service plan; effective date.
Title
Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; sanctions; jury trial; individualized service plan; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Merrick |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Merrick; authored by Senator Bullard |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13 |
2022-03-14 | House | Amended |
2022-03-14 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-14 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Merrick (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |