OK HB3186 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred to Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; Insurance Consumer Rights Act; algorithms; discrimination; Insurance Commissioner; investigations; effective date.
Title
Insurance; Insurance Consumer Rights Act; algorithms; discrimination; Insurance Commissioner; investigations; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Insurance Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2022-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Phillips |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3186&Session=2200 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB3186%20INT.PDF |