OK HB3176 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; fines and penalties; expanding list of regulations for which fines and penalties may be established and enforced; repeat violations; eliminating requirement; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; fines and penalties; expanding list of regulations for which fines and penalties may be established and enforced; repeat violations; eliminating requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Stan May [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David) |
2020-02-27 | House | Remove Representative West (Kevin) as principal House author and substitute with Representative May |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |