OK HB3173 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; waterfowl hunting stamps; providing waterfowl license fee; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; waterfowl hunting stamps; providing waterfowl license fee; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] | Sen. Paul Scott [R] | Rep. Jeff Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Scott (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody |
2018-02-28 | House | Remove Representative Coody as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs |
2018-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Wildlife |
2018-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |