OK HB3168 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Capitol Building; authorizing Capitol Improvement Authority to issue obligations for repair; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Capitol Building; authorizing Capitol Improvement Authority to issue obligations for repair; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-27HouseApproved by Governor 06/06/2016
2016-05-26HouseSent to Governor
2016-05-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2016-05-26HouseReferred for enrollment
2016-05-26SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2016-05-26SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 16
2016-05-26SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2016-05-11SenateDirect to Calendar
2016-03-10SenateFirst Reading
2016-03-10HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2016-03-09HouseReferred for engrossment
2016-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 43
2016-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author)
2016-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2016-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2016-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Hickman
2016-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback