OK HB3164 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 05/27/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; creating procedure for seasonal workers; setting procedure for determination and appeal; effective date.
Title
Labor; creating procedure for seasonal workers; setting procedure for determination and appeal; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 22 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2016-05-18 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 22 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2016-05-18 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House: SHALL DECISION OF CHAIR BE DECISION OF HOUSE (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 05/27/2016 |
2016-05-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-18 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-18 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 |
2016-05-18 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newberry, Bice, Silk, Halligan, Brown, Wyrick, Pittman |
2016-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2016-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 12 |
2016-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-10 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDaniel (Randy) |
2016-02-10 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor and Retirement Laws Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor and Retirement Laws |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 2 | 404 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |